House
|
05/22/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 865.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 817.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 41, nays 9. S.J. 816.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Substituted for SF 508. S.J. 816.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 508. S.J. 651.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 651.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 726.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 706.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 3. H.J. 701.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1136 adopted. H.J. 701.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1134, yeas 35, nays 59, lost. H.J. 700.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1135 adopted. H.J. 700.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amendments H-1135 and H-1136 filed. H.J. 679.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Amendment H-1134 filed. H.J. 676.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 484.
|
|
|