Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill March 21, 2023