House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1007.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 978.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 937.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1311. H.J. 936.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1311 filed. H.J. 913.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 950.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 949.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment S-3178 filed, adopted. S.J. 949.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted for SF 523. S.J. 948.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 523. S.J. 695.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 695.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 725.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 715.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amendment H-1140 adopted. H.J. 715.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1140 filed. H.J. 709.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 511.
|
|
|