Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Amended

Bill March 22, 2023