House | 02/15/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 323. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Subcommittee: Gehlbach, Ehlert and Moore, T. H.J. 208. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 206. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |