House | 02/22/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 425. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 385. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 2:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Boden and Brown-Powers. H.J. 261. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 258. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |