House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 495. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 428. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Collins and Srinivas. H.J. 261. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 259. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |