House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 553. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 446. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Moore, T. and Turek. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |