House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 573. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 471. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 12:30PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Collins and Scheetz. H.J. 359. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 358. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |