Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB171

Introduced
2/15/23  
Introduced
2/15/23  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 573.)

Companion Bills

IA SSB1153

Related A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

IA SF364

Replaced by A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1153.)

IA HF573

Replaced by A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 171.) Effective date: 05/03/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 06/14/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

Similar Bills

IA HF573

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 171.) Effective date: 05/03/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 06/14/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

IA SF364

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1153.)

IA SSB1153

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

IA HF567

A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 159.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

CA SB1473

Local Government Omnibus Act of 2020.

IA SF514

A bill for an act relating to the organization, structure, and functions of state government, providing for salaries of appointed state officers, providing for penalties, making appropriations, providing Code editor directives and transition provisions, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1123.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: Enactment, 07/01/2023.

CA AB474

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.

CA AB2438

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.