Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF573

Introduced
3/2/23  
Engrossed
3/9/23  
Introduced
3/2/23  
Enrolled
5/3/23  
Engrossed
3/9/23  
Enrolled
5/3/23  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 171.) Effective date: 05/03/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 06/14/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

Impact

The bill's amendments will influence how Iowa's state laws approach vehicle registration pertaining to the emerging electric vehicle market. By establishing these fees, the state aims to ensure that electric vehicle owners contribute fairly to the maintenance of the infrastructure, which traditionally has been funded by fuel taxes. This is crucial as the internal combustion engine vehicles decrease in number and electric vehicles become more prevalent on state highways. The legislation is an acknowledgment of the transition to green transportation solutions and the need for sustainable funding sources.

Summary

House File 573 aims to update and correct statutory language to reflect current practices regarding the registration of battery electric and plug-in hybrid electric motor vehicles. The bill introduces specific annual registration fees for these electric vehicles, which are designed to create a system of vehicle registrations that better accommodates the growing number of electric vehicles on the road. The fee structures outlined in the bill gradually increase registration fees starting from 2020, ultimately reaching a maximum amount by 2022, ensuring that revenue generated aligns with road usage and maintenance costs associated with electric vehicles.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding House File 573 appears mixed among stakeholders. Supporters of the bill highlight its importance in promoting electric vehicles and integrating them into the existing framework of transportation policy in Iowa. They argue that these changes are necessary to address the fiscal implications associated with the wide adoption of electric vehicles. Conversely, opponents express concern about the financial burden the new fees may place on some consumers, particularly in light of already existing economic challenges. The conversations around the bill indicate a need for balanced approaches to support sustainable transportation while also considering affordability for the populace.

Contention

One of the notable points of contention regarding House File 573 is the potential impact on low-income families and individuals who might struggle with the financial implications of increased registration fees for electric vehicles. While the bill is positioned as a step toward promoting cleaner energy and modernizing transportation systems, critics argue that the fees may deter consumers from making the switch to more environmentally friendly options. There is a call for broader discussions regarding incentivizing electric vehicle usage while also ensuring the policy does not disproportionately affect economically disadvantaged groups.

Companion Bills

IA SF364

Similar To A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1153.)

IA SSB1153

Related A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

IA HSB171

Related A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 573.)

Similar Bills

IA SF364

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1153.)

IA HSB171

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 573.)

IA SSB1153

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

CA SB1473

Local Government Omnibus Act of 2020.

CA AB474

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.

IA HF567

A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 159.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

CA AB2438

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.

IA SF514

A bill for an act relating to the organization, structure, and functions of state government, providing for salaries of appointed state officers, providing for penalties, making appropriations, providing Code editor directives and transition provisions, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1123.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: Enactment, 07/01/2023.