Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF364

Introduced
2/22/23  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1153.)

Impact

The bill has notable implications for state statutes, particularly those concerning the authority of local governments, tax assessments, and public safety protocols. For instance, amendments relating to budget variances and tax assessments are expected to streamline processes for local governments, providing greater clarity about their powers and obligations. Moreover, the updates to emergency management protocols imply that local authorities can better navigate the financial challenges presented by major disasters, potentially leading to quicker responses and effectiveness in governance. However, the retroactive applicability of certain amendments has raised questions about legal implications for past actions taken under previously uncorrected statutes.

Summary

Senate File 364 involves various statutory corrections aimed at refining Iowa's legal framework. The bill proposes amendments that serve to update language, correct inaccuracies, and clarify existing provisions related to the state code. These corrections address a multitude of areas within state governance, including but not limited to budget reviews, tax levies, and the handling of local governmental functions in the wake of major disasters. Overall, the bill seeks to enhance the legislative process by ensuring that laws reflect current practices and eliminate ambiguities that could lead to misinterpretation or legal complications.

Contention

While SF364 is largely technical and focused on corrections, some stakeholders have expressed concerns regarding the retroactive amendments, fearing it may inadvertently impact ongoing legal proceedings or decisions made prior to the updates. Detractors argue that such changes could complicate existing laws and create confusion about their application. Nonetheless, proponents contend that these measures are necessary for legal clarity and improving the overall functionality of Iowa's legal system, arguing that clearer laws will serve both the public and the government effectively in the long run.

Companion Bills

IA HF573

Similar To A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 171.) Effective date: 05/03/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 06/14/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

IA SSB1153

Related A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

IA HSB171

Related A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 573.)

Similar Bills

IA HF573

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 171.) Effective date: 05/03/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 06/14/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

IA HSB171

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 573.)

IA SSB1153

A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 364.)

IA HF567

A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 159.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.

CA SB1473

Local Government Omnibus Act of 2020.

IA SF514

A bill for an act relating to the organization, structure, and functions of state government, providing for salaries of appointed state officers, providing for penalties, making appropriations, providing Code editor directives and transition provisions, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1123.) Contingent effective date. Applicability date: Enactment, 07/01/2023.

CA AB474

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.

CA AB2438

California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.