Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 763.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 786.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 12. S.J. 784.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate concurred with S-5120. S.J. 784.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Message from House, with amendment S-5120. S.J. 745.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 738.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 730.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 60, nays 34. H.J. 729.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendment H-8236 adopted. H.J. 729.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendments H-8242, H-8247 and H-8256 out of order. H.J. 729.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendment H-8239 withdrawn. H.J. 729.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendment H-8273 filed, adopted. H.J. 729.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Amendment H-8256 filed. H.J. 698.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Amendment H-8247 filed. H.J. 682.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Amendment H-8242 filed. H.J. 658.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Amendments H-8236 and H-8239 filed. H.J. 639.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 606.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 606.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 12:00PM RM 19.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee reassigned: Hora, Kurth and Sexton. H.J. 452.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee: Hora, Judge and Sexton. H.J. 451.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 427.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 402.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 401.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 400.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment S-5023 adopted. S.J. 400.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment S-5029 filed, lost. S.J. 399.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment S-5028 filed, lost. S.J. 398.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment S-5023 filed. S.J. 398.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 336.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 334.
|
|
|