Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF2391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2024

Amended

Bill February 27, 2024