House
|
05/04/2023
|
Rereferred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 1030.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment H-1194 filed. H.J. 779.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Amendments H-1188, H-1189, H-1190, H-1191, and H-1192 filed. H.J. 774.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Amendments H-1185 and H-1187 filed. H.J. 773.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee amendment H-1166 filed. H.J. 744.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 743.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 743.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/21/2023 8:15AM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Subcommittee: Wood, Kniff McCulla and Matson. H.J. 674.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 652.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 650.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 578.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 3. S.J. 578.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Amendment S-3068 adopted. S.J. 577.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Amendment S-3066 withdrawn. S.J. 577.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Amendments S-3066 and S-3068 filed. S.J. 556.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 363.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 357.
|
|
|