Senate | 04/19/2023 | Withdrawn. S.J. 884. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | HF 475 substituted. S.J. 883. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Amendment S-3122 adopted. S.J. 883. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment S-3122 filed. S.J. 769. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Attached to HF 475. S.J. 540. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 426. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 419. |