Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1005.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 947.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 947.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1327, yeas 34, nays 60. H.J. 946.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1327, ruled not germane. H.J. 946.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment H-1327 filed. H.J. 945.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 783.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 748.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 748.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 5-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:00PM RM 304.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Subcommittee: Lohse, Amos Jr., Bossman, Holt and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 727.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 706.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 650.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 577.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 576.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Amendment S-3075 filed, adopted. S.J. 576.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 476.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 464.
|
|
|