Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Amended

Bill March 15, 2023