Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF557

Introduced
4/4/23  
Engrossed
4/26/23  
Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/27/23  
Engrossed
4/26/23  
Enrolled
5/16/23  
Refer
4/27/23  
Passed
6/1/23  
Enrolled
5/16/23  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and Iowa utilities board, creating a licensing and regulation fund, and modifying provisions related to major procurement contracts for the Iowa lottery division of the department of revenue. (Formerly SSB 1209.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Impact

The legislation is expected to significantly enhance the regulatory framework for state contracts and appropriations, potentially leading to improved public trust in state operations. By focusing on thorough background checks for vendors and implementing strict procurement standards, the bill aims to protect the integrity of state operations against fraud or misconduct. Furthermore, the establishment of a considerable licensing and regulation fund allows for flexibility in managing funds over multiple fiscal years without the risk of reversion, facilitating smoother transitions in state funding management and operational effectiveness across all impacted departments. This structure may streamline financial management and improve accountability in the use of public funds.

Summary

Senate File 557 addresses various appropriations for state government administration and regulation, impacting numerous departments such as Administrative Services, Inspections, Appeals and Licensing, Revenue, and Financial Services. The bill outlines budget allocations for the fiscal year 2023-2024, ensuring that state agencies have the necessary funding to operate effectively and meet their regulatory responsibilities. This includes provisions for contracting and procurement processes, emphasizing the need for transparency and integrity throughout the operations of state-run departments. One key aspect addresses the Iowa Lottery's procurement contracts, establishing mandatory background checks and vetting processes for vendors to ensure compliance and security in dealings.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SF 557 has generally been positive among legislators who advocate for enhanced accountability and transparency in state operations. Stakeholders, such as state departments and agencies, view the appropriations positively as they believe it enhances their ability to serve the public efficiently. However, there may be some contention regarding budget allocations and the adequacy of funding for certain departments, with concerns that some essential services could be underfunded in comparison to others. Regardless, the overarching narrative supports the bill as a crucial step towards modernizing and fortifying the state's administrative framework.

Contention

Notable points of contention may arise from the set budgets provided for state agencies and how these funds are to be allocated among various state functions. Some legislators might express concerns about whether all essential services are adequately funded, particularly in areas like healthcare and social services, which are often critical but may not receive comparable budget priority. Additionally, establishing stringent requirements for vendor disclosures and background checks may lead to pushback from businesses that perceive such regulations as excessive. Balancing the need for robust oversight with business interests presents an ongoing challenge that may fuel future discussions surrounding the bill's implementation.

Companion Bills

IA SSB1209

Related A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 557.)

Previously Filed As

IA SSB1209

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 557.)

Similar Bills

IA SF2433

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities board. (Formerly SSB 3199.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.

IA SSB3199

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities board.(See SF 2433.)

IA SSB1209

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 557.)

IA HF2696

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities board.

IA SSB1235

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities commission.

IA SSB1217

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, office of civil rights, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities commission.

IA SF562

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1214.) Effective date: Enactment, 06/01/2023, 06/30/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 07/01/2022.

IA SSB1224

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including a corrections capital reinvestment fund, the funding of activities relating to consumer education and litigation, and a corrections federal receipts fund, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.