Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1034.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 977.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 60, nays 35. H.J. 966.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment H-1326, yeas 34, nays 61, lost. H.J. 965.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 957.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment H-1326 filed. H.J. 954.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
NOBA: House Sub
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 917.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 917.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Subcommittee: Bergan, Amos Jr. and Young. H.J. 917.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: [].
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 916.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 916.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 976.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 975.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment S-3183 adopted. S.J. 975.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment S-3183 filed. S.J. 963.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 735.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 733.
|
|
|