Senate | 04/21/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 1010. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 1005. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Substituted for HF 163. H.J. 1004. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/03. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 03/18. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 566. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Amendment S-3026 filed, adopted. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 473. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 462. |