House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0112
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|