House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0516
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|