House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|