House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/06/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |