House | 05/19/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/19/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |