House | 04/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |