House
|
08/14/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0792
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|