House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0121
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 042-012-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|