House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 08/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |