House | 05/15/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |