House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |