House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|