House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0130
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Re-assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|