House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-012-000 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |