Senate | 03/24/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson |