House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0132
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|