House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0653
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date July 19, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|