House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0286
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|