House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0287
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|