House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |