House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0288
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|