House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0295
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|