House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 015-000-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |