House
|
07/25/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0268
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Effective Date July 25, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|