House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0150
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|