House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 007-002-000 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |