House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0301
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|