House | 05/31/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/26/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 | ||
House | 05/24/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000 | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Rules Committee; Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |