Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2292 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/10/2023

                            103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2292 Introduced , by Rep. Maura Hirschauer SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  305 ILCS 5/5-5.05  Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the $630 per diem rate to be paid to safety net-hospitals for inpatient psychiatric services on and after January 1, 2021, removes language making the payment rate subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2021.  LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2292 Introduced , by Rep. Maura Hirschauer SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  305 ILCS 5/5-5.05 305 ILCS 5/5-5.05  Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the $630 per diem rate to be paid to safety net-hospitals for inpatient psychiatric services on and after January 1, 2021, removes language making the payment rate subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2021.  LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b     LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2292 Introduced , by Rep. Maura Hirschauer SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
305 ILCS 5/5-5.05 305 ILCS 5/5-5.05
305 ILCS 5/5-5.05
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the $630 per diem rate to be paid to safety net-hospitals for inpatient psychiatric services on and after January 1, 2021, removes language making the payment rate subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2021.
LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b     LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
    LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
A BILL FOR
HB2292LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   HB2292  LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
  HB2292  LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
1  AN ACT concerning public aid.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Public Aid Code is amended by
5  changing Section 5-5.05 as follows:
6  (305 ILCS 5/5-5.05)
7  Sec. 5-5.05. Hospitals; psychiatric services.
8  (a) On and after July 1, 2008, the inpatient, per diem rate
9  to be paid to a hospital for inpatient psychiatric services
10  shall be $363.77.
11  (b) For purposes of this Section, "hospital" means the
12  following:
13  (1) Advocate Christ Hospital, Oak Lawn, Illinois.
14  (2) Barnes-Jewish Hospital, St. Louis, Missouri.
15  (3) BroMenn Healthcare, Bloomington, Illinois.
16  (4) Jackson Park Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
17  (5) Katherine Shaw Bethea Hospital, Dixon, Illinois.
18  (6) Lawrence County Memorial Hospital, Lawrenceville,
19  Illinois.
20  (7) Advocate Lutheran General Hospital, Park Ridge,
21  Illinois.
22  (8) Mercy Hospital and Medical Center, Chicago,
23  Illinois.

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2292 Introduced , by Rep. Maura Hirschauer SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
305 ILCS 5/5-5.05 305 ILCS 5/5-5.05
305 ILCS 5/5-5.05
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the $630 per diem rate to be paid to safety net-hospitals for inpatient psychiatric services on and after January 1, 2021, removes language making the payment rate subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2021.
LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b     LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
    LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

305 ILCS 5/5-5.05



    LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b

 

 



 

  HB2292  LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b


HB2292- 2 -LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   HB2292 - 2 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
  HB2292 - 2 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
1  (9) Methodist Medical Center of Illinois, Peoria,
2  Illinois.
3  (10) Provena United Samaritans Medical Center,
4  Danville, Illinois.
5  (11) Rockford Memorial Hospital, Rockford, Illinois.
6  (12) Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Mattoon,
7  Illinois.
8  (13) Provena Covenant Medical Center, Urbana,
9  Illinois.
10  (14) Rush-Presbyterian-St. Luke's Medical Center,
11  Chicago, Illinois.
12  (15) Mt. Sinai Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
13  (16) Gateway Regional Medical Center, Granite City,
14  Illinois.
15  (17) St. Mary of Nazareth Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
16  (18) Provena St. Mary's Hospital, Kankakee, Illinois.
17  (19) St. Mary's Hospital, Decatur, Illinois.
18  (20) Memorial Hospital, Belleville, Illinois.
19  (21) Swedish Covenant Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
20  (22) Trinity Medical Center, Rock Island, Illinois.
21  (23) St. Elizabeth Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
22  (24) Richland Memorial Hospital, Olney, Illinois.
23  (25) St. Elizabeth's Hospital, Belleville, Illinois.
24  (26) Samaritan Health System, Clinton, Iowa.
25  (27) St. John's Hospital, Springfield, Illinois.
26  (28) St. Mary's Hospital, Centralia, Illinois.

 

 

  HB2292 - 2 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b


HB2292- 3 -LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   HB2292 - 3 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
  HB2292 - 3 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
1  (29) Loretto Hospital, Chicago, Illinois.
2  (30) Kenneth Hall Regional Hospital, East St. Louis,
3  Illinois.
4  (31) Hinsdale Hospital, Hinsdale, Illinois.
5  (32) Pekin Hospital, Pekin, Illinois.
6  (33) University of Chicago Medical Center, Chicago,
7  Illinois.
8  (34) St. Anthony's Health Center, Alton, Illinois.
9  (35) OSF St. Francis Medical Center, Peoria, Illinois.
10  (36) Memorial Medical Center, Springfield, Illinois.
11  (37) A hospital with a distinct part unit for
12  psychiatric services that begins operating on or after
13  July 1, 2008.
14  For purposes of this Section, "inpatient psychiatric
15  services" means those services provided to patients who are in
16  need of short-term acute inpatient hospitalization for active
17  treatment of an emotional or mental disorder.
18  (b-5) Notwithstanding any other provision of this Section,
19  and subject to appropriation, the inpatient, per diem rate to
20  be paid to all safety-net hospitals for inpatient psychiatric
21  services on and after January 1, 2021 shall be at least $630.
22  (b-10) Notwithstanding any other provision of this
23  Section, effective with dates of service on and after January
24  1, 2022, any general acute care hospital with more than 9,500
25  inpatient psychiatric Medicaid days in any calendar year shall
26  be paid the inpatient per diem rate of no less than $630.

 

 

  HB2292 - 3 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b


HB2292- 4 -LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b   HB2292 - 4 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
  HB2292 - 4 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b
1  (c) No rules shall be promulgated to implement this
2  Section. For purposes of this Section, "rules" is given the
3  meaning contained in Section 1-70 of the Illinois
4  Administrative Procedure Act.
5  (d) This Section shall not be in effect during any period
6  of time that the State has in place a fully operational
7  hospital assessment plan that has been approved by the Centers
8  for Medicare and Medicaid Services of the U.S. Department of
9  Health and Human Services.
10  (e) On and after July 1, 2012, the Department shall reduce
11  any rate of reimbursement for services or other payments or
12  alter any methodologies authorized by this Code to reduce any
13  rate of reimbursement for services or other payments in
14  accordance with Section 5-5e.
15  (Source: P.A. 102-4, eff. 4-27-21; 102-674, eff. 11-30-21.)
16  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect July 1,
17  2023.

 

 

  HB2292 - 4 - LRB103 29502 KTG 55897 b